Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 07:00:04 (UTC).

LUDIVINA NACIONALES VS G. RICHARD GREEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 LUDIVINA NACIONALES filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against G RICHARD GREEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2428

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NACIONALES LUDIVINA AKA LUDIVINA MAGALLANES LELIM

Respondents

GREEN G. RICHARD

GREEN & MARKER A PARTNERSHIP

MARKER RICHARD A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID HENRY

Respondent Attorney

BAE MINDY SUN

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

3/1/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/1/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENTS G. RICHARD GREEN, RICHARD A. MARKER, AND GREEN & MARKERS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, TO DESIGNATE ARBITRATION ADMINISTRATOR, AND DECLARE ARBITRAT

1/19/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENTS G. RICHARD GREEN, RICHARD A. MARKER, AND GREEN & MARKERS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, TO DESIGNATE ARBITRATION ADMINISTRATOR, AND DECLARE ARBITRAT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF G. RICHARD GREEN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

1/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF G. RICHARD GREEN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MINDY S. BAE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

1/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MINDY S. BAE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRANCES OMEARA IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

1/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRANCES OMEARA IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Request for Judicial Notice

1/19/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE RESPONDENTS AMENDED NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ITS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS

1/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE RESPONDENTS AMENDED NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ITS OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/29/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/29/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Hearing on Petition

9/11/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/31/2020: Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HENRY S. DAVID IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/31/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HENRY S. DAVID IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LUDIVINA NACIONALES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/31/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LUDIVINA NACIONALES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (Amended Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by G. Richard Green (Respondent); Richard A. Marker (Respondent); Green & Marker, a partnership (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER); Filed by G. Richard Green (Respondent); Richard A. Marker (Respondent); Green & Marker, a partnership (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 2:46 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/01/2021, and the JUDGMENT); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by G. Richard Green (Respondent); Richard A. Marker (Respondent); Green & Marker, a partnership (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by G. Richard Green (Respondent); Richard A. Marker (Respondent); Green & Marker, a partnership (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Henry S. David in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Ludivina Nacionales in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPetition (to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Ludivina Nacionales (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN & MARKER A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID HENRY