This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 08:20:03 (UTC).

LUCY SOLORIO VS SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 LUCY SOLORIO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8011

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLORIO LUCY

Defendants

FCA US LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHOV STEVE

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW MILLARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

7/29/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANTS SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY AND FCA US LLC PEREMPTO...) OF 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANTS SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY AND FCA US LLC PEREMPTO...) OF 08/31/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY AND FCA US LLC PEREMPTO...)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY AND FCA US LLC PEREMPTO...)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Answer

8/30/2021: Answer

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/31/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES LUCY SOLORIO

9/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES LUCY SOLORIO

Case Management Statement

9/29/2021: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (LUCY SOLORIO); Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 3:57 PM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendants San Fernando Motor Company and FCA US LLC Perempto...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY, a California Corporation (Defendant); FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Defendants San Fernando Motor Company and FCA US LLC Perempto...) of 08/31/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY, a California Corporation (Defendant); FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LUCY SOLORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY D/B/A RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant