This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2022 at 07:47:34 (UTC).

LUCY SANCHEZ-ALONSO VS CITY OF DOWNEY, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 LUCY SANCHEZ-ALONSO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF DOWNEY, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6702

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ-ALONSO LUCY

Defendant

CITY OF DOWNEY A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOSHARIAN PETER ASHOT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2024
  • Hearing12/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LUCY SANCHEZ-ALONSO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LUCY SANCHEZ-ALONSO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LUCY SANCHEZ-ALONSO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF DOWNEY A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOSHARIAN PETER A. ESQ.