Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 12:18:30 (UTC).

LUCKY STAR CARRIERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 LUCKY STAR CARRIERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ONSITE TRUCK EQUIPMENT REPAIR, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2824

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUCKY STAR CARRIERS LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CATERPILLAR INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

QUINN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

QUINN COMPANY DBA QUINN POWER SYSTEMS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

QUINN COMPANY DBA QUINN POWER SYSTEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'REILLY EDWARD J.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CLINTON DAVID A.

KWONG PAUL C

PARKS COLTON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KWONG PAUL C

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF, LUCKY STAR CARRIERS, LLCS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

5/21/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF, LUCKY STAR CARRIERS, LLCS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT, ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR INC. S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT SET ONE; MEMORANDUM O

4/30/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT, ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR INC. S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT SET ONE; MEMORANDUM O

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

4/16/2021: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CATERPILLAR, INC.) OF 02/26/2021, JUDGMENT

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CATERPILLAR, INC.) OF 02/26/2021, JUDGMENT

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (JENNIFER SEBRING, CSR # 13749)

1/28/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (JENNIFER SEBRING, CSR # 13749)

Order - ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

1/26/2021: Order - ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE S...)

1/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE S...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE S...) OF 01/26/2021

1/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE S...) OF 01/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

12/21/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Case Management Statement

12/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT CATERPIL...) OF 11/12/2020

11/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT CATERPIL...) OF 11/12/2020

Demand for Jury Trial

10/2/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/7/2020: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/13/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Hearing07/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Hearing06/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketReply (Defendant, Onsite Truck & Equipment Repair, Inc.s Reply To Plaintiff, Lucky Star Carriers, LLCs Opposition To Defendants Motion To Compel Further Responses); Filed by Onsite Truck & Equipment Repair, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketJoinder to Motion (to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Defendant, Quinn Company); Filed by Onsite Truck & Equipment Repair, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOpposition (EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR, INC'S SPECIAL INTERROGATOMES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE); Filed by Lucky Star Carriers, LLC, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Quinn Company DBA Quinn Power Systems (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Quinn Company DBA Quinn Power Systems (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Onsite Truck & Equipment Repair, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Onsite Truck & Equipment Repair, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lucky Star Carriers, LLC, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lucky Star Carriers, LLC, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lucky Star Carriers, LLC, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONSITE TRUCK & EQUIPMENT REPAIR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., is a litigant

Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KWONG PAUL C. ESQ.