This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 06:58:29 (UTC).

LUCINDA DE LOS SANTOS VS ARJO INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 LUCINDA DE LOS SANTOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ARJO INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9613

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LOS SANTOS LUCINDA

Defendants

ARJO INC. DBA ARJOHUNTLEIGH

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAMB JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2024
  • Hearing10/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • Hearing04/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lucinda De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lucinda De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lucinda De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lucinda De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lucinda De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lucinda De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arjo-Century Distributing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMB JEFFREY