This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2022 at 11:29:34 (UTC).

LUCILA O. MOLINA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS GUADALUPE AGUILERA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 LUCILA O MOLINA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUADALUPE AGUILERA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3652

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOLINA AN INDIVIDUAL LUCILA O.

OCHOA AN INDIVIDUAL ELVIRA

Defendants

AGUILERA AN INDIVIDUAL GUADALUPE

AGUILERA AN INDIVIDUAL JAZMYNE MISHELERIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGOLI SHAWN L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/14/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2024
  • Hearing11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LUCILA O. MOLINA, an Individual (Plaintiff); ELVIRA OCHOA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LUCILA O. MOLINA, an Individual (Plaintiff); ELVIRA OCHOA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LUCILA O. MOLINA, an Individual (Plaintiff); ELVIRA OCHOA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANGOLI SHAHRAM