This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 12:53:27 (UTC).

LUCIA & ALFREDO CRUZ VS TOSHIKO HONDA, INDIVIDUALLY; ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 LUCIA ALFREDO CRUZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TOSHIKO HONDA, INDIVIDUALLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2037

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRUZ LUCIA

CRUZ ALFREDO

Defendants

HONDA TOSHIKO INDIVIDUALLY

HONDA TOSHIKO TRUSTEE OF THE TOSHIKO...

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

HONDA TOSHIKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL S. DAMSKY ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ZACHARY D. SCHORR

SCHORR ZACHARY D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by LUCIA CRUZ (Plaintiff); ALFREDO CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT; ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by TOSHIKO, HONDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (ANS. OF DEFT., TOSHIKO HONDA'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by TOSHIKO, HONDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Answer; Filed by TOSHIKO, HONDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by LUCIA CRUZ (Plaintiff); ALFREDO CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LUCIA CRUZ (Plaintiff); ALFREDO CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: TOSHIKO HONDA DATE OF SERVED: 6/22/17 AT 8:19A.M BY PERSONAL SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: TOSHIKO HONDA DATE OF SERVED: 6/22/17 AT 8:1 A.M BY PERSONAL SERVICE. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LUCIA CRUZ (Plaintiff); ALFREDO CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by LUCIA CRUZ (Plaintiff); ALFREDO CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by LUCIA CRUZ (Plaintiff); ALFREDO CRUZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less