Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 03:40:03 (UTC).

LUCERO, PATRICIA VS JONES, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 LUCERO, PATRICIA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JONES, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUCERO PATRICIA

Respondent

JONES CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POLINGER THOMAS MARC

Respondent Attorney

STENZEL ANH NGUYEN

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - ***Amended on 03/25/21; see page 2 items 6 and 7 and see DV140***

3/25/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - ***Amended on 03/25/21; see page 2 items 6 and 7 and see DV140***

Minute Order

3/25/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - of ELECTRONIC SERVICE

3/22/2021: Proof of Service - of ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Response - Domestic Violence

3/22/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/25/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/10/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 03/25/21 Dept 11 8:30am

3/10/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 03/25/21 Dept 11 8:30am

Proof of Service

3/12/2021: Proof of Service

Substitution of Attorney

2/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 03/10/21 Dept 11 8:30am

2/16/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 03/10/21 Dept 11 8:30am

Minute Order

2/16/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 02/16/21 Dept 11 8:30am

1/29/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 02/16/21 Dept 11 8:30am

Minute Order

1/29/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/14/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Hearing04/20/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 11 at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (***Amended on 03/25/21; see page 2 items 6 and 7 and see DV140*** ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (of ELECTRONIC SERVICE ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 02/16/21 Dept 11 8:30am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Partly Granted and Partly Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STENZEL ANH NGUYEN