This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 02:03:55 (UTC).

LUCAS NALEPINSKI, ET AL. VS ALFREDO MUNOZ RODRIGUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 LUCAS NALEPINSKI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALFREDO MUNOZ RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6425

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NALEPINSKI JENNIFER AKA SEUNGHEE NALEPINSKI

NALEPINSKI LUCAS

Defendants

AV GENERAL CONTRACTOR

RODRIGUEZ ALFREDO MUNOZ AKA ALFREDO RODRIGUEZ AKA ALFREDO MUNOZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS ASHTON R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

11/2/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment

11/2/2020: Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

9/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/01/2020

9/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LUCAS NALEPINSKI IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LUCAS NALEPINSKI IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ASHTON WATKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ASHTON WATKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/4/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment) of 11/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without prejudice, as to Does 1-10 Only); Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff); Jennifer Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Lucas Nalepinski in support of default judgment); Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff); Jennifer Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff); Jennifer Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff); Jennifer Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lucas Nalepinski (Plaintiff); Jennifer Nalepinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV16425    Hearing Date: November 02, 2020    Dept: 40

DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP CHECKLIST

(CRC Rule 3.1800)

Case Name: Lucas Nalepinski v. AV General Contractor Case #: 20STCV16425

Hearing Date: 11/2/20 Total Amount: $476,941.10

Defaulting Party: Defendants AV General Contractor & Alfredo Munoz Rodriguez aka Alfredo Rodriguez aka Alfredo Munoz

BACKGROUND: Plaintiff Lucas Nalepinski (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against his former contractors Defendants AV General Contractor and Alfredo Munoz Rodriguez aka Alfredo Rodriguez aka Alfredo Munoz (collectively, “Defendants”). Defendants promised to complete several improvements on Plaintiff’s property for $158,400. Defendants failed to complete the work and caused damage to the property.

[X] DEFAULT ENTERED ON: 6/30/20 against Defendants

[X] MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM CIV-100 SUBMITTED FOR ENTRY OF

COURT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800(a))

[X] SERVICE:

Complaint and Summons

[X] DECLARATION OF MAILING -- Request for Entry of Default to Defendant (CCP § 587)

[X] NO PENDING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

[X] SUMMARY OF CASE PROVIDED (CRC 3.1800(a)(1)) - or other declaration OK [ ]

[X] EVIDENTIARY DECLARATIONS/OTHER EVIDENCE (CRC 3.1800(a)(2))

[X] RELIEF PRAYED FOR IN COMPLAINT (same as requested in default?): [X] yes[ ] no

[X] Compensatory: $ 371,280.00

Special: $

General: $ 100,000.00 [Punitive Damages]

[ ] Interest: $

[X] Costs: $ 661.10

[X] Attorney’ Fees: $ 5,000.00

Total: $ 476,941.10

[N/A] INTEREST COMPUTATIONS (CRC 3.1800(a)(3))

[X] ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION -- Request according to Local Rule 3.214 or reason provided why greater fees should be allowed (CRC 3.1800(b))

Fees allowed by statute CCP section 1029.8(a).

[X] MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (CRC 3.1800(a)(4))

[X] STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (CCP § 425.11):

[X] Punitive demanded [X] Evidence of net worth of defendant? [ ] Yes [X] No

[X] DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS executed within 6 months? [

9/30/20

[X] REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (CRC 3.1800(a)(7))

[N/A] WAS DEFAULTING DEFENDANT A DOE? (CCP § 474) - must do one of the following:

[N/A] ORIGINALS Promissory note or other written obligation to pay money must be provided for cancellation by the Clerk per CRC 3.1806

[X] PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT INCLUDED (CRC 3.1800(a)(6))

RECOMMENDATION:

The judgment will be granted without the punitive damages request. If plaintiff wishes further consideration regarding punitives, they may attempt to provide evidence of Defendants’ net worth. (See City of El Monte (1994) 29 Cal.App.4th 272, 276, [“Evidence of the defendant’s financial condition is a prerequisite to an award of punitive damages.”].)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS ASHTON RYAN