This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2021 at 01:38:26 (UTC).

LUANN SMITH, ET AL. VS ONE MEDICAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 LUANN SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ONE MEDICAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9342

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH LUANN

Defendants

ONE MEDICAL

CHIRICHIGNO M.D. JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARGOS JASON

Defendant Attorney

LYNCH GREGORY G.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM DALLAS

5/21/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM DALLAS

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM JULIAN

5/28/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM JULIAN

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM EDWARD

5/28/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM EDWARD

Answer

7/22/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/22/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

7/10/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

9/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES]

10/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES]

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

10/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Hearing06/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES); Filed by One Medical (Defendant); Jason Chirichigno, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Errata); Filed by One Medical (Defendant); Jason Chirichigno, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by One Medical (Defendant); Jason Chirichigno, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by One Medical (Defendant); Jason Chirichigno, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by One Medical (Defendant); Jason Chirichigno, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Dallas Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Dallas Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Edward); Filed by Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Dallas Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Julian); Filed by Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Dallas Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Dallas Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Dallas); Filed by Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Dallas Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Luann Smith (Plaintiff); Dallas Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARGOS JASON NICHOLAS