This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2022 at 05:53:48 (UTC).

LUALHATI PETELO VS LAZARO JESUS MARTIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 LUALHATI PETELO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAZARO JESUS MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0861

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETELO LUALHATI

Defendants

CITY OF TORRANCE

MARTIN LAZARO JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BECK MITCHELL

BROWN DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

LITVIN JEANNE-MARIE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/11/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

4/18/2022: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2025
  • Hearing01/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lazaro Jesus Martin (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Lualhati Petelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lualhati Petelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lualhati Petelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lualhati Petelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lualhati Petelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK MITCHELL