This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 01:24:14 (UTC).

LQQ LLC., A CA. LTD. LIAB. CO. VS KISHA WATERS

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 LQQ LLC , A CA LTD LIAB CO filed an Other lawsuit against KISHA WATERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0586

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LQQ LLC. A CA. LTD. LIAB. CO.

Defendant

WATERS KISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/5/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (KISHA WATERS)

8/5/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (KISHA WATERS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Case Management Statement

9/24/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((KISHA WATERS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LQQ LLC., A CA. LTD. LIAB. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by LQQ LLC., A CA. LTD. LIAB. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LQQ LLC., A CA. LTD. LIAB. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LQQ LLC., A CA. LTD. LIAB. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.