This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 12:43:30 (UTC).

LOWTHER, ROY - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 LOWTHER, ROY - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2031

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MISTRI ADALBERTO

Not Classified By Court

LOWTHER ROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHEASBY MATTHEW EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

3/2/2022: Proposed - Affidavit - Real Property of Small Value

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

3/16/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEASBY, MATTHEW E.