This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 06:12:32 (UTC).

LOUIZA KHACHATUROVA, ET AL. VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 LOUIZA KHACHATUROVA, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2274

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KARAPETIAN LEVON

KHACHATUROVA LOUIZA

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JAGUAR VAN NUYS/LAND ROVER VAN NUYS A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

Defendant Attorney

WOLF MATTHEW C.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/6/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/07/2022

12/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/07/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/18/2023: Answer

Answer

1/23/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); As to: Louiza Khachaturova (Plaintiff); Levon Karapetian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Louiza Khachaturova (Plaintiff); Levon Karapetian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Louiza Khachaturova (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/27/2022; Service Cost: 175.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/07/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Louiza Khachaturova (Plaintiff); Levon Karapetian (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Louiza Khachaturova (Plaintiff); Levon Karapetian (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Louiza Khachaturova (Plaintiff); Levon Karapetian (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less