This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 13:19:44 (UTC).

LOUISE G. BEDDOW, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 LOUISE G BEDDOW filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3587

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEDDOW ELIZABETH W.

BEDDOW LOUISE G.

FONDUE THE OAKS LLC DBA THE MELTING POT A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

LL&J WINES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

WHITE JERRY W. JR.

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FEES

6/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FEES

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

5/12/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service by Mail

5/17/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/17/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/15/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

6/17/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

4/29/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

4/29/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

4/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination

5/3/2022: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Posting Complex Designation Fees); Filed by Louise G. Beddow (Plaintiff); Elizabeth W. Beddow (Plaintiff); Jerry W. White, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order re: Petition for Coordination of Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Louise G. Beddow (Plaintiff); Elizabeth W. Beddow (Plaintiff); Jerry W. White, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Louise G. Beddow (Plaintiff); Elizabeth W. Beddow (Plaintiff); Jerry W. White, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-on Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Petition for Coordination; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Add-On on Petition (of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Louise G. Beddow (Plaintiff); Elizabeth W. Beddow (Plaintiff); Jerry W. White, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Louise G. Beddow (Plaintiff); Elizabeth W. Beddow (Plaintiff); Jerry W. White, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Louise G. Beddow (Plaintiff); Elizabeth W. Beddow (Plaintiff); Jerry W. White, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Louise G. Beddow (Plaintiff); Elizabeth W. Beddow (Plaintiff); Jerry W. White, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON ESQ JOHN