Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2020 at 01:45:05 (UTC).

LOUIS WENDRUCK VS GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 LOUIS WENDRUCK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2655

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WENDRUCK LOUIS

Defendants

GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUZA ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUSSMAN MARC IRWIN

Defendant Attorney

ERICSON ROBERT BRENDAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/23/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/5/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALISON GAMBLE IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZA'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALISON GAMBLE IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZA'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Reply - REPLY OF DEFENDANTS GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL AND ROBERT SOUZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/12/2019: Reply - REPLY OF DEFENDANTS GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL AND ROBERT SOUZA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN ROTH

7/15/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN ROTH

Motion to Compel Arbitration - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/26/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT SOUZA IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZAS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT SOUZA IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZAS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT B ERICSON IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZAS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT B ERICSON IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZAS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT B ERICSON IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZAS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT B ERICSON IN SUPPORT OF GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL'S AND ROBERT SOUZAS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/2/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

3/21/2019: Answer

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/5/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

3/6/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/26/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketStatus Report (ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT); Filed by GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Hearing); Filed by LOUIS WENDRUCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Marc Irwin Zussman (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); ROBERT SOUZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by GAMBLE JONES INVESTMENT COUNSEL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); ROBERT SOUZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by LOUIS WENDRUCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LOUIS WENDRUCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LOUIS WENDRUCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LOUIS WENDRUCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less