This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 20:14:16 (UTC).

LOUIS PINK EVANS, JR., ET AL. VS 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 LOUIS PINK EVANS, JR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3724

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EVANS LOUIS PINK JR.

EVANS SANDRA

Defendants

3M COMPANY FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ABB INC.

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

ALFA LAVAL INC.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC

BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE OPERATIONS LLC

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL COMPANY

CARRIER CORPORATION

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC. FKA AQUA CHEM

CROWN CORK & SEAL USA INC.

DANA COMPANIES LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

DAP INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO. INC. KNA LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO. INC.

EATON CORPORATION

FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST

FMC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FROST SCOTT L.

SEITZ ANDREW LON

Defendant Attorney

HUIE JEREMY DARWIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

4/22/2022: Notice - NOTICE PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer - HENRY COMPANY LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

6/10/2022: Answer - HENRY COMPANY LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketHenry Company LLC?s Answer To Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos; Filed by Henry Company LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Louis Pink Evans, Jr. (Plaintiff); Sandra Evans, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Louis Pink Evans, Jr. (Plaintiff); Sandra Evans, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Louis Pink Evans, Jr. (Plaintiff); Sandra Evans, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice (Preliminary Fact Sheet); Filed by Louis Pink Evans, Jr. (Plaintiff); Sandra Evans, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as successor to the former Vellumoid division of Federal-Mogul is a litigant

Latest cases where Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant