This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 00:12:37 (UTC).

LOUIS HAHNE VS TOM MCVEIGH, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 LOUIS HAHNE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TOM MCVEIGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2452

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAHNE LOUIS

Defendants

MCVEIGH ANGELA

MCVEIGH TOM

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STANLEY DENIS ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF STANLEY DENIS

DENIS STANLEY THEODORE JR

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/4/2017: Unknown

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

11/13/2017: Summons

Unknown

11/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/23/2018: Unknown

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/23/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/23/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Related Case

3/26/2018: Notice of Related Case

Unknown

3/27/2018: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

3/27/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Case Management Statement

3/28/2018: Case Management Statement

Unknown

4/3/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/6/2018: Unknown

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketNotice OF CASE REASIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by TOM MCVEIGH (Defendant); ANGELA MCVEIGH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by LOUIS HAHNE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2452    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: B

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. B

LOUIS HAHNE,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

****2452

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

TOM MCVEIGH, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: January 10, 2020

Moving Parties: Petitioner Louis Hahne

Responding Party: Respondent Angela McVeigh

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

The court considered the moving, opposition, and reply papers.

RULING

The petition is GRANTED. Judgment shall be entered in conformity with the confirmed Final Arbitration Award. CCP ;1287.4.

BACKGROUND

On November 13, 2017, plaintiff Louis Hahne filed a complaint against Tom McVeigh and Angela McVeigh for conversion, elder abuse, breach of contract, malicious prosecution, and declaratory relief.

LEGAL AUTHORITY

Under CCP ;1285, any party to an arbitration in which an award has been made may petition the court to confirm, correct or vacate the award. The petition shall name as respondents all parties to the arbitration and may name as respondents any other persons bound by the arbitration award.

Under CCP ;1285.4, a petition under this chapter shall: (a) Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement. (b) Set forth names of the arbitrators. (c) Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.

Under CCP ;1286, if a petition or response under this chapter is duly served and filed, the court shall confirm the award as made, whether rendered in this state or another state, unless in accordance with this chapter it corrects the award and confirms it as corrected, vacates the award or dismisses the proceedings.

DISCUSSION

Petitioner requests that the court confirm the Final Arbitration Award dated November 15, 2019 against Angela McVeigh.

Petitioner explains that on June 26, 2018, the court ordered the claims against defendant/respondent Angela McVeigh to binding arbitration. On September 12, 2019, an arbitration hearing was conducted by Hon. Jacqueline A. Connor (Ret.) at ADR Services, Inc. On December 3, 2019, the arbitrator served a Final Arbitration Award, dated November 15, 2019.

Petitioner has complied with CCP ;1285.4 by attaching the agreement to arbitrate, the name of the arbitrator, and a copy of the final award. The final award was in favor of claimant/petitioner for $43,800. The arbitrator granted claimant’s motion for attorney’s fees and costs in the reduced amounts of $70,800 in attorney’s fees and $13,724.65 in costs.

In opposition, respondent contends that she has been willing to pay the award and that the motion was unnecessary. Respondent asserts any additional attorney’s fees and costs are not warranted with respect to the petition and motion to confirm.

In reply, petitioner contends that the petition was necessary because respondent was not willing to pay the full amount of the award and that, to date, respondent has not tendered any amount.

As petitioner has complied with the applicable statute and respondent has not provided any grounds to correct or vacate the award, the petition is GRANTED.

As for attorney’s fees and costs, “[t]he court shall award costs upon any judicial proceeding under this title as provided in Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 1021) . . . .” CCP ;1293.2. Costs are subject to a memorandum of costs and attorney’s fees are subject to a motion.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of the ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENIS STANLEY THEODORE