This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:50:46 (UTC).

LOUIS DOMINGUEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ALEX DOMINGUEZ, ET AL. VS 7-ELEVEN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 LOUIS DOMINGUEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ALEX DOMINGUEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7-ELEVEN, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1397

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOMINGUEZ INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ALEX DOMINGUEZ LOUIS

DOMINGUEZ INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ALEX DOMINGUEZ TERESA

Defendants

7-ELEVEN INC.

L&M VENTURES LLC

LAWSON SADARIUS

NATIONWIDE GUARD SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES COLIN M

Defendant Attorneys

MIHAI RACHEL A.

MUNOZ PATRICIA M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/1/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/24/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

2/24/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

2/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/30/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/30/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

12/27/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/27/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Louis Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); Teresa Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X updated: Result Date to 02/27/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Louis Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); Teresa Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt: Name Extension: blank ; Document changed from Notice (name extension) to Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt ; As To Parties changed from L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant) to L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Nationwide Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Nationwide Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant), Nationwide Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant), Sadarius Lawson (Defendant), L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant) to Nationwide Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant), 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant), Sadarius Lawson (Defendant), L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Louis Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); Teresa Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant); Nationwide Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Louis Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); Teresa Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant); Nationwide Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Louis Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); Teresa Dominguez, individually and as successor in interest to Alex Dominguez (Plaintiff); As to: 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant); L&M Ventures, LLC (Defendant); Nationwide Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less