This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2022 at 04:51:02 (UTC).

LOUIS BARLIA VS ALTMAN LIGHTING CO.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 LOUIS BARLIA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALTMAN LIGHTING CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9760

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARLIA LOUIS

Defendants

ALTMAN LIGHTING CO.

AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES INC.

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES DBA ED. PINAUD AND NESTLE-LE MUR COMPANY

ANIXTER INC.

AVENTIS INC.

BARDWELL & MCALISTER INC.

BARDWELL & MCALISTER LIGHTING INC.

BELDEN INC.

COLUMBIA PICTURES INDUSTRIES INC.

COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. DBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO.

DANA CLASSIC FRAGRANCES INC.

FISONS CORPORATION

FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS INC.

GSK CONSUMER HEALTH INC. FKA NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH INC FKA CIBA SELF-MEDICATION INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

METRO-GOLDWYN-MAYER PICTURES INC.

METRO-GOLDWYN-MAYER STUDIOS INC.

MOLE-RICHARDSON CO. LTD.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SEITZ ANDREW LON

FROST SCOTT L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

6/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTIFICATION OF DEATH AND AUTOMATIC STAY

6/30/2022: Notice - NOTIFICATION OF DEATH AND AUTOMATIC STAY

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

7/25/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/21/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/21/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (FROST LAW FIRM))

8/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (FROST LAW FIRM))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by David Barlia (Plaintiff); Kevin Barlia (Plaintiff); Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by David Barlia (Plaintiff); Kevin Barlia (Plaintiff); Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: Group (Frost Law Firm))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Louis Barlia (Plaintiff); David Barlia (Plaintiff); Kevin Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotification of Death and Automatic Stay; Filed by Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice (Preliminary Fact Sheet); Filed by Louis Barlia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aventis is a litigant

Latest cases where FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Fisons Corporation is a litigant