This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 11:52:39 (UTC).

LOUI RUDAS, ET AL. VS HERCULES INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 LOUI RUDAS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against HERCULES INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6968

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUDAS LOUI

LOUI AND DRAGICA RUDAS AS CO-TRUSTEES OF THE RUDAS FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

SCHMIDT BRADY

HERCULES INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SCHMIDT ERIN MAUREEN

MCDONALD JR. JAMES A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENGALI OMAR H

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES LOUI RUDAS

6/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES LOUI RUDAS

Case Management Statement

6/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/16/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

8/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

10/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Continuance

12/2/2021: Notice of Continuance

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (LOUI RUDAS); Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Loui Rudas (Plaintiff); Loui and Dragica Rudas as Co-Trustees of The Rudas Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERCULES INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENGALI OMAR H