Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2021 at 14:57:58 (UTC).

LOTTIE JORDAN, ET AL. VS WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 LOTTIE JORDAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5000

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JORDAN WARNER

JORDAN LOTTIE

Defendants

BEAUCHAMP JAMES B.

THUNDER ROAD INVESTMENTS INC.

STORAGE PROPERTIES INC.

TELCO INC.

PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA INC.

STORAGE PROPERTIES L.P.

WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

5/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

5/12/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2024
  • Hearing04/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • Hearing10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lottie Jordan (Plaintiff); Warner Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lottie Jordan (Plaintiff); Warner Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lottie Jordan (Plaintiff); Warner Jordan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUBLIC STORAGE GOLETA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARZBAN MICHAEL M.