This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 05:25:15 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLC VS REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 LOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3358

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Respondent

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AVILES KELLY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

9/14/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS ACT WITH EXHIBITS A THROUGH M.

9/12/2022: Petition - PETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS ACT WITH EXHIBITS A THROUGH M.

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

9/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mitchell L. Beckloff in Department 86 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPetition VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS ACT WITH EXHIBITS A THROUGH M. Filed by: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (Petitioner); As to: Regents of the University of California (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (Petitioner); As to: Regents of the University of California (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (Petitioner); As to: Regents of the University of California (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant