This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 11:26:22 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN, CONSERVATOR FOR CONSERVATEE, MONIQUE KEELEY, DECEASED VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN, CONSERVATOR FOR CONSERVATEE, MONIQUE KEELEY, DECEASED filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2370

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN CONSERVATOR FOR CONSERVATEE MONIQUE KEELEY DECEASED

Defendant

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONNER CALEB

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2023
  • Hearing12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against plaintiff in the amount of $150.00 for Failure to Serve the Complaint pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.110(b)(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2023
  • Hearing12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against plaintiff in the amount of $150.00 for Failure to Serve the Complaint pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.110(b)(f) scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN, CONSERVATOR FOR CONSERVATEE, MONIQUE KEELEY, DECEASED (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN, CONSERVATOR FOR CONSERVATEE, MONIQUE KEELEY, DECEASED (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC dba Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN, CONSERVATOR FOR CONSERVATEE, MONIQUE KEELEY, DECEASED (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC dba Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN, CONSERVATOR FOR CONSERVATEE, MONIQUE KEELEY, DECEASED (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC dba Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less