This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 16:03:34 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY VS DAVID S. KHANDABI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against DAVID S KHANDABI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4205

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendants

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELL FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK

KOHANBASH JESSICA SARA

SHAMTOOB ESKANDAR

KHANDABI DAVID S.

RECON TRUST COMPANY N.A.

WONG SHIRLEY MING-YEE

PRLAP INC.

MORE PETER

FRIEDMAN HARRIET S.

HALL JOHN

FRIEDMAN RICHARD E.

AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER

PEYKAR AKRAM

IN THE PROPERTIES ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AND INTEREST

CTC REAL ESTATE SERVICES

INTERBANK

TITLE 365 COMPANY INC.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM INC. MERS

HALL YVETTE

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DELGADO BRYAN R.

BROWN KELLI MADELEINE

BANKER ANISH

CHAFFIN DAVID LEE

LEWIN JAMES FALK

MALCOLM WILLIAM GUY

Other Attorneys

FRIAS GUILLERMO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF LISTS OF EXPERT WITNESS AND STATEMENT OF VALUATION

9/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF LISTS OF EXPERT WITNESS AND STATEMENT OF VALUATION

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 22, 2021

9/23/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 22, 2021

Proof of Service by Mail

9/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

9/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

8/20/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (PARCEL W-4105)

8/20/2021: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (PARCEL W-4105)

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/8/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

7/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

7/19/2021: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

4/27/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2023
  • Hearing10/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 22, 2021); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (Demand for Exchange of Lists of Expert Witness and Statement of Valuation); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, a public entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TITLE 365 COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CTC Real Estate Services, a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where RECON TRUST COMPANY N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRLAP INC. is a litigant