This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 13:13:29 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY VS ROBERT B. MANUEL III, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ROBERT B MANUEL III,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4264

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS SUCCESSOR INDENTURE TRUSTEE UNDER NOVASTAR MORTGAGE FUNDING TRUST SERIES 2006-MTA1

MANUEL III ROBERT B. AN INDIVIDUAL

LANDAMERICA SOUTHLAND TITLE; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. A CORPORATION

CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORTGAGEIT INC. A CORPORATION

TRIANGLE HOME INVESTMENTS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MANUEL PHILESIA MORRIS AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOZIO ALAN A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

11/25/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION AND CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION

11/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION AND CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULTS OF DEFENDANTS CAL WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION MORTGAGEIT INC AND TRIANGLE HOME INVESTMENTS LLC

10/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULTS OF DEFENDANTS CAL WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION MORTGAGEIT INC AND TRIANGLE HOME INVESTMENTS LLC

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/2/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

10/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC HEARING RE SERVICE

10/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC HEARING RE SERVICE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/7/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND. TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN; ORDER

9/27/2019: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND. TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN; ORDER

Case Management Statement

9/25/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/27/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND. TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN; ORDER

9/27/2019: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND. TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN; ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

9/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

9/6/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice ( Of Withdrawal Of Plaintiff Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authoritys Motion For Order For Prejudgment Possession And Certification Of Tax Information); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to all defendants) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice ( Of Entry Of Defaults Of Defendants Cal Western Reconveyance Corporation Mortgageit Inc And Triangle Home Investments Llc); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice (DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 07/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens (NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF EMINENT DOMAIN ACTION); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTGAGEIT INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOZIO ALAN