This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 01:20:02 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY VS MISSOURI PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MISSOURI PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8041

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendants

YUFA AN INDIVIDUAL ANNA

CHINATRUST BANK U.S.A A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

YI AN INDIVIDUAL CHRISTY WONG WING

JIA AN INDIVIDUAL NAN

KEVILLE AN INDIVIDUAL TERRI DONNA

LEONG AN INDIVIDUAL JAY

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA

MISSOURI PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

KEVILLE AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS SHOKOAH

ZARIFPOUR AN INDIVIDUAL FARIDEH

BOZIN AN INDIVIDUAL MIKE

NATIONWIDE TITLE CLEARING

YUSKA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LIU TRUSTEE OF THE LIU LIVING TRUST

LADERA LENDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. MERS

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LIU AN INDIVIDUAL AND TRUSTEE OF THE EMILY F. LIU TRUST

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALABI TALIN

SOZIO ALAN A.

Defendant Attorney

BACON MARY E

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/22/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/22/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN REPLY RE: PLAINTIFF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR AN ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION AND CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION [CODE CIV.

6/9/2021: Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN REPLY RE: PLAINTIFF LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITYS MOTION FOR AN ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION AND CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION [CODE CIV.

Case Management Statement

6/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT P...)

6/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT P...)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VALUE OF BETH B. FINESTONE

1/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VALUE OF BETH B. FINESTONE

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

1/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

1/27/2021: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDERS FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Deposit); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Value Of Beth B. Finestone); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMotion re: (for Orders for Prejudgment Possession); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a California Public Entity (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ladera Lending, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Liu (DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF, Chun is a litigant

Latest cases where CHINATRUST BANK (USA) is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant