This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 00:07:30 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES CENTER FOR ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY VS UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 LOS ANGELES CENTER FOR ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3754

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CENTER FOR ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY

Defendant

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/25/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

7/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/1/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • Hearing10/27/2022 at 10:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A