This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 09:00:57 (UTC).

LORNA POUNDS VS STATE OF CA DEPT OF SOCIAL SERVICES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 LORNA POUNDS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against STATE OF CA DEPT OF SOCIAL SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7954

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

POUNDS LORNA

Defendants and Respondents

ECHAVEZ RISSA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL

DOES 1 TO 80

Not Classified By Court

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HENNIG ROB ESQ.

HENNING RUIZ P.C.

HENNIG ROBERT ALAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

XAVIER BECERRA

LOGAN-STEARN MICHELLE DEPUTY ATTY GEN.

LOGAN-STERN MICHELLE DANETTE

BECERRA XAVIER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

3/15/2019: Unknown

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ETC.

6/7/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ETC.

DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND SPECIAL DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/25/2017: DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND SPECIAL DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE LOGAN-STERN RE MEET AND CONFER BEFORE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/17/2017: DECLARATION OF MICHELLE LOGAN-STERN RE MEET AND CONFER BEFORE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/9/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration

2/1/2019: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

1/3/2019: Ex Parte Application

Proof of Service by Mail

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion for Summary Adjudication

2/1/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Minute Order

3/19/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

9/29/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/15/2019: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

4/4/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Stipulation

3/15/2019: Stipulation

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/27/2017: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF LORNA POUNDS' WORKERS' COMPENSATION RECORDS; ETC.

11/29/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF LORNA POUNDS' WORKERS' COMPENSATION RECORDS; ETC.

Minute Order

7/13/2017: Minute Order

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (off calendar at the request by moving party) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Objection (to Defendant's Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Lorna Pounds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Lorna Pounds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Lorna Pounds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Opposition ( to Motion to Summary Adjudication); Filed by Lorna Pounds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Other - (Compendium of Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Lorna Pounds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-07-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FEHA - FAILURE TO ACCOMMODATE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • COMILAINT FOR: 1. FEHA - FAILURE TO ACCOMMODATE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Lorna Pounds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less