This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2021 at 16:59:38 (UTC).

LORNA JAMES VS MY LIQUOR BANK & MARKET, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 LORNA JAMES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MY LIQUOR BANK MARKET, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7503

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES LORNA

Defendant

MY LIQUOR BANK & MARKET INC. DBA BUDDHA MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UZOH AZUKA LOUIS

Defendant Attorney

BREMER KEITH G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/10/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/10/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

5/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

5/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

6/21/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2024
  • Hearing05/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by My Liquor Bank & Market, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lorna James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lorna James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lorna James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lorna James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREMER KEITH