This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 14:42:47 (UTC).

LORI T. RAY VS MOUSTAPHA S. DIABY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 LORI T RAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOUSTAPHA S DIABY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4685

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY LORI T.

Defendants

BROWN ANGEL

DIABY MOUSTAPHA S.

ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC.

NATIONAL CAR RENTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

11/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lori T. Ray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lori T. Ray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lori T. Ray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lori T. Ray (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL CAR RENTAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS is a litigant