This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 06:07:27 (UTC).

LORETTA A. MALVEAUX VS WALMART, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 LORETTA A MALVEAUX filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0592

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALVEAUX LORETTA A.

Defendants

TURNER DAWN

WALMART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ YESENIA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2024
  • Hearing07/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Loretta A. Malveaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Loretta A. Malveaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Loretta A. Malveaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ YESENIA