This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 09:15:21 (UTC).

LORENZO, OBANDO V. VS TESTA LORENZO, ANA CECILIA

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 LORENZO, OBANDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VS TESTA LORENZO, ANA CECILIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1904

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LORENZO OBANDO V.

Respondent

TESTA LORENZO ANA CECILIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/17/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

12/17/2019: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

12/17/2019: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/17/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

12/17/2019: Notice - Case Assignment

FL_General Family Law - FL - Court Order - Share Financial Information (FAM111)

12/17/2019: FL_General Family Law - FL - Court Order - Share Financial Information (FAM111)

Request - Enter Default FL165

2/18/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - 4C

2/18/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - 4C

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 12/20/19

2/18/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 12/20/19

Judgment

3/3/2020: Judgment

Declaration - Default FL170

3/3/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Notice - Entry of Judgment

3/25/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (4C ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served 12/20/19 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSQUEDA ROMAN P.