This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 19:55:37 (UTC).

LORENZO MARTINEZ VS FADI ABI ATMI

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 LORENZO MARTINEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FADI ABI ATMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9656

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINEZ LORENZO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

ATMI FADI ABI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CALHOUN ERIC G.

NICHOLSON MARLYSS JEAN

Defendant Attorney

MONTGOMERY MICHAEL BRUCE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT FADI ABI ATMI'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/13/2018: DEFENDANT FADI ABI ATMI'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order

9/18/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/18/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

10/23/2018: Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

Separate Statement - Separate Statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents (set one)

11/28/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents (set one)

Separate Statement - Separate Statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's requests for admissions set one

11/28/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's requests for admissions set one

Separate Statement - Separate Statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories (set one)

11/28/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories (set one)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for form interrogatories (set one)

11/28/2018: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for form interrogatories (set one)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for special interrogatories (set one)

11/28/2018: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for special interrogatories (set one)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for admissions (set one)

11/28/2018: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for admissions (set one)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for production of documents (set one)

11/28/2018: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's request for production of documents (set one)

Notice - Notice OF HEARINGS CONTINUED BY THE COURT INCLUDING: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SPECIAL INTERROGAT

1/11/2019: Notice - Notice OF HEARINGS CONTINUED BY THE COURT INCLUDING: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SPECIAL INTERROGAT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice Of Settlement Of Entire ...) of 02/22/2019

2/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice Of Settlement Of Entire ...) of 02/22/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/29/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

4/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

SUMMONS -

3/26/2018: SUMMONS -

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) PER SE VIOLATIONS OF THE UNRUB ACT (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51, ET SEQ.); ETC

3/26/2018: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) PER SE VIOLATIONS OF THE UNRUB ACT (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51, ET SEQ.); ETC

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 39; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal After Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lorenzo Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's Request for Special Interrogatories (Set One), and Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's Request for Production of Documents (Set One) and Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses to Plaintiff Lorenzo Martinez's Request for Form Interrogatories (Set One) and Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lorenzo Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) PER SE VIOLATIONS OF THE UNRUB ACT (CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51, ET SEQ.); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTGOMERY MICHAEL B.