Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 05:21:08 (UTC).

LORENZO HERNANDEZ VS SERGEY STEPANENKO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 LORENZO HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SERGEY STEPANENKO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1434

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ LORENZO

Defendants

STEPANENKO SERGEY

UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORIN ILONA

Defendant Attorney

BREMER KEITH GLENN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/16/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/10/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sergey Stepanenko (Defendant); United Independent Taxi Drivers Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lorenzo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lorenzo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lorenzo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lorenzo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lorenzo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREMER KEITH