This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 02:13:41 (UTC).

LORENA S. SOLORZANO ANDRES0N VS MICHAEL A. PULICE

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 LORENA S SOLORZANO ANDRES0N filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL A PULICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5322

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLORZANO ANDRES0N LORENA S.

Defendant

PULICE MICHAEL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PENNELL JONATHAN MAYNARD

Defendant Attorney

SMITH-MARS DENISE A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/5/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/5/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/5/2022: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

10/18/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/18/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2024
  • Hearing08/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Michael A. Pulice (Defendant); As to: Lorena S. Solorzano Andres0n (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Michael A. Pulice (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Michael A. Pulice (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lorena S. Solorzano Andres0n (Plaintiff); As to: Michael A. Pulice (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lorena S. Solorzano Andres0n (Plaintiff); As to: Michael A. Pulice (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lorena S. Solorzano Andres0n (Plaintiff); As to: Michael A. Pulice (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PENNELL JONATHAN M.