This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2022 at 10:00:01 (UTC).

LORENA NARANJO LICEA VS THC-ORANGE COUNTY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 LORENA NARANJO LICEA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THC-ORANGE COUNTY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0585

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NARANJO LICEA LORENA

Defendants

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING LLC

THC-ORANGE COUNTY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HEDWAT RAPHAEL BENJAMIN

HEDWAT RAPHAEL B.

SACHANI ALI M.

Defendant Attorney

VIGIL HEATHER M.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2022

5/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2022

Case Management Statement

5/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/10/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/7/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2023
  • Hearing10/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Disassociation of Counsel); Filed by Lorena Naranjo Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docketat 11:15 AM in Department 56, Holly J. Fujie, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/10/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by THC-ORANGE COUNTY, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lorena Naranjo Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by THC-ORANGE COUNTY, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lorena Naranjo Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lorena Naranjo Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lorena Naranjo Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lorena Naranjo Licea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THC-ORANGE COUNTY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEDWAT RAPHAEL B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SACHANI ALI