This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2022 at 01:18:56 (UTC).

LORENA HERNANDEZ, ET AL. VS EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 LORENA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1122

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORES LOUIS

HERNANDEZ LORENA

Defendants

EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA EMANATE HEALTH INTER-COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

SALEMI HENGAMEH MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIGALA GILBERT D.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/11/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/11/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/11/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/11/2022: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/11/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/11/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2025
  • Hearing01/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LORENA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); LOUIS FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LORENA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); LOUIS FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LORENA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); LOUIS FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIGALA GILBERT D.