This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 02:21:41 (UTC).

LOREN WILLIAM MARSHALL, JR. VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 LOREN WILLIAM MARSHALL, JR filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0763

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSHALL LOREN WILLIAM JR.

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

OH ROBERT SAEHAN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/2/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

9/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/8/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/30/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Loren William Marshall, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Loren William Marshall, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Loren William Marshall, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Loren William Marshall, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/12/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Loren William Marshall, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Loren William Marshall, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Loren William Marshall, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OH, ROBERT S.