This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 05:23:31 (UTC).

LOREN KAPLAN VS BRYAN RINCON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 LOREN KAPLAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRYAN RINCON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT and KERRY BENSINGER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5323

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

KERRY BENSINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAPLAN LOREN

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CONTRERASLUCHI MAXIMO

MARTINEZ JESSICA BURLAZA

RINCON BRYAN

Cross Defendant and Defendant

RINCON BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHULTZ ESQ THOMAS A

Defendant Attorneys

SHAPIRO STEPHEN A.

REISINGER ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

3/13/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal

3/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);)

3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT);)

Request for Dismissal

11/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/09/2022

11/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/09/2022

Notice of Settlement

11/3/2022: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

2/25/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

2/25/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/25/2022: Answer

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

2/25/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Cross-Complaint

12/13/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/13/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: Bryan Rincon (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Filed by: Jessica Burlaza Martinez (Cross-Complainant); As to: Bryan Rincon (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Jessica Burlaza Martinez on 02/25/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jessica Burlaza Martinez as to Bryan Rincon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jessica Burlaza Martinez (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Maximo Contrerasluchi on 12/13/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maximo Contrerasluchi as to Bryan Rincon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MAXIMO CONTRERAS LUCHI Erroneously Sued As Maximo Contrerasluchi (Cross-Complainant); As to: Bryan Rincon (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement);)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 04/12/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Loren Kaplan (Plaintiff); As to: Maximo Contrerasluchi (Defendant); Service Date: 10/04/2021; Service Cost: 162.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Loren Kaplan (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Rincon (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/01/2021; Service Cost: 155.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Loren Kaplan (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Rincon (Defendant); Jessica Burlaza Martinez (Defendant); Maximo Contrerasluchi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Loren Kaplan (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Rincon (Defendant); Jessica Burlaza Martinez (Defendant); Maximo Contrerasluchi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Loren Kaplan (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Rincon (Defendant); Jessica Burlaza Martinez (Defendant); Maximo Contrerasluchi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less