Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 10:57:20 (UTC).

LORDI, SHAWN VS LORDI, CARLA GENE

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 LORDI, SHAWN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LORDI, CARLA GENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0490

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LORDI SHAWN

Respondent

LORDI CARLA GENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EADS PAUL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Separate Property

6/2/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Proof of Service of Summons

6/2/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

6/2/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Request - Enter Default FL165

6/2/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Request - Enter Default FL165

6/2/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

6/7/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

6/8/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - Separate Property

6/8/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Request - Enter Default FL165

6/8/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/29/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/29/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

3/29/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/29/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Case Assignment

4/1/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/1/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EADS PAUL ANTHONY