Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 01:30:38 (UTC).

LOPEZ VILLEGAS, MARLEN VS VILLEGAS, STEVEN LOUIS

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 LOPEZ VILLEGAS, MARLEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VILLEGAS, STEVEN LOUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WEINGART, GREGORY J and ROSEN, DAVID A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8577

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WEINGART, GREGORY J

ROSEN, DAVID A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ VILLEGAS MARLEN

Respondent

VILLEGAS STEVEN LOUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NATHANS MICHAEL HAROLD

Respondent Attorney

SKLAN JEFFREY FREDRICH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 65, Weingart, Gregory J, Presiding; Conference - Advanced - Previous Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 65, Weingart, Gregory J, Presiding; Hearing - Advanced - Previous Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Judgment Package Received After Hearing (sent to dept.65 on 07/23/18 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice (RELATED CASE - BD640840 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Support; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Order - Attend Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less