Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 12:24:01 (UTC).

LOPEZ, MICHELLE VS BELTRAN, FRANCISCO O.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 LOPEZ, MICHELLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BELTRAN, FRANCISCO O. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0016

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ MICHELLE

Respondent

BELTRAN FRANCISCO O.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

1/28/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

1/28/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

1/28/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/13/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/13/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/13/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/13/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/13/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less