Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 21:39:27 (UTC).

LOPEZ GOMEZ, NATAN - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 LOPEZ GOMEZ, NATAN - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1478

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ GOMEZ NATAN

Not Classified By Court

GOMEZ SAMUEL LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHEN MITCHELL HSIH-FUI

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte - Application - (Drop Off). For Early Setting With Declaration

4/8/2021: Ex Parte - Application - (Drop Off). For Early Setting With Declaration

Notice - Hearing

5/6/2021: Notice - Hearing

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

5/6/2021: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

5/6/2021: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Notice - Hearing

5/6/2021: Notice - Hearing

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

5/6/2021: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Declaration of Due Diligence

5/6/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

5/6/2021: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Memorandum - Points and Authorities

5/6/2021: Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Notice - Hearing

5/6/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

5/19/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

5/25/2021: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

5/25/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

2/18/2021: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

Declaration - UCCJEA

2/18/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings

2/18/2021: Petition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings

Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

2/18/2021: Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/19/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Special Immigrant Juvenile Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Eligibility for Special Immigrant Juvenile Status; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Nominee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Guardian (Person Only ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application ((Drop Off). For Early Setting With Declaration ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketConsent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEN MITCHELL HSIH-FUI