This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 15:13:41 (UTC).

LOPEZ, AMANDA CHARLOTTE BENITO - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 LOPEZ, AMANDA CHARLOTTE BENITO - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8378

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ AMANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIMON ROBERT TERRENCE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

8/24/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

Minute Order

9/28/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order as Order After Hearing

9/28/2022: Minute Order as Order After Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order as Order After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON ROBERT TERRENCE