This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 19:18:34 (UTC).

LONNIE GILLESPIE VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 LONNIE GILLESPIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0760

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILLESPIE LONNIE

Defendants

CALIFORNIA STATE TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CITY OF LONG BEACH

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

MORENO AREVALO CRISTOFER LUIS

MORRISON THOMAS

NAIRN JERRY EUGENE JR.

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH MARC L.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint

2/18/2022: Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

2/18/2022: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

1/18/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2025
  • Hearing01/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LONNIE GILLESPIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California State Transportation Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BELLFLOWER is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH MARC L.