This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 00:35:18 (UTC).

LONG ANH NGUYEN VS WILSON EMAH BASSEY

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 LONG ANH NGUYEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILSON EMAH BASSEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2906

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NGUYEN LONG ANH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

BASSEY WILSON EMAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CARRAZCO LAW A.P.C.

GILBERT DON W.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENCE

8/18/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS

8/18/2017: SUMMONS

Ex Parte Application

5/24/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/8/2019: Notice

Stipulation and Order

4/4/2019: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

1/31/2019: Stipulation and Order

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/1/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

STIPULATION TO INSURANCE POLICY LIMITS

10/1/2018: STIPULATION TO INSURANCE POLICY LIMITS

Unknown

10/1/2018: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/1/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial date) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial date)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (To Continue Trial Date;); Filed by Long Anh Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE); Filed by Long Anh Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRAIL, FSC AND RELATED DATES - FSC: 06-28-19 Trial: 07-16-19); Filed by Long Anh Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Proposed Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial- FSC 5/3/19 TRIAL 5/21/19); Filed by Long Anh Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Wilson Emah Bassey (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketStipulation to Insurance Policy Limits; Filed by Long Anh Nguyen (Plaintiff); Wilson Emah Bassey (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Wilson Emah Bassey (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO INSURANCE POLICY LIMITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Long Anh Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less