This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 18:00:25 (UTC).

LON DEREK CARTER VS NITOSHA LYNN BENJAMIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 LON DEREK CARTER filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NITOSHA LYNN BENJAMIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5176

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTER LON DEREK

Defendants

BENJAMIN NITOSHA LYNN

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LACMTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTOIA ADINA A

Defendant Attorney

LOGAN AMBER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/28/2021: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/18/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2024
  • Hearing09/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lon Derek Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LACMTA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSTOIA ADINA A.