This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2022 at 06:12:16 (UTC).

LOIS UNGAR VS ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUDD & ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 LOIS UNGAR filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUDD ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAWRENCE P. RIFF and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4877

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNGAR LOIS

Defendants

TROTTER CHELSEA N.

ANDRE CHRISTOPHER S.

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUDD & ROMO A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

STEVENSON KATHERINE R.

PALMER JAMES H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCKLEY WEBER ILLECE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN BINDI...)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN BINDI...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

8/31/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN BINDI...) OF 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN BINDI...) OF 08/31/2021

Request for Dismissal

8/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Substitution of Attorney

8/2/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES LOIS UNGAR

6/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES LOIS UNGAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/16/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 02/26/2021

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 02/26/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 3:37 PM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Participate in Arbitration and Stay Action); Filed by Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Rudd & Romo, a Professional Law Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN BINDI...) of 08/31/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN BINDI...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Defs Palmer, Andre, Trotter, Stevenson only); Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 02/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lois Ungar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less