This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 06:05:23 (UTC).

LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP VS NOVIAN & NOVIAN, LLP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS HOWARD, LLP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against NOVIAN NOVIAN, LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0104

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LODGEN LACHER GOLDITCH SARDI SAUNDERS & HOWARD LLP

Respondents

NOVIAN & NOVIAN LLP

NOVIAN FARHAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ESENSTEN ROBERT LAWRENCE

Respondent Attorney

NOVIAN FARHAD

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND JUDGMENT THERON

12/9/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND JUDGMENT THERON

Case Management Statement

12/9/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/10/2020

12/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/10/2020

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/8/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. ESENSTEN IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1281, ET SEQ.

10/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. ESENSTEN IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1281, ET SEQ.

Answer

10/9/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/13/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/24/2020: Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Status Conference and Order

2/26/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((not entered)); Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Based on Stipulation and Order (Binding Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by NOVIAN & NOVIAN, LLP (Respondent); Farhad Novian (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Enter Judgment on Petition to Compel Arbitration and Judgment Theron); Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NOVIAN & NOVIAN, LLP (Respondent); Farhad Novian (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPetition (to Compel Arbitration); Filed by LODGEN, LACHER, GOLDITCH, SARDI, SAUNDERS & HOWARD, LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LODGEN LACHER GOLDITCH SARDI SAUNDERS is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVIAN & NOVIAN LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESENSTEN ROBERT LAWRENCE ESQ.